Trustees MILLBROOK VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity Number: 272971

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alyson Smith | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wright | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Wright | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clair Drury | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Baldry | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Edwards | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stokoe | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANICE WRIGHT | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
THERESA EVAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA SHAYLER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.