GOLDEN LION CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising and helping disadvantaged children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 April 1977: Standard registration
- GLCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Rodgers | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON HEAD | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE THOMAS | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Liz Le Roux | Trustee | 03 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY EVANS | Trustee | 03 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEVE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACK SHIRVELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.21k | £29.99k | £18.97k | £38.58k | £36.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.74k | £28.22k | £28.00k | £34.34k | £41.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 7TH APRIL 1976 AND 1ST MAY 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 400
LEWES
EAST SUSSEX
BN8 4RZ
- Phone:
- 01273 891963
- Email:
- enquiries@glct.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window