ACLE WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recreation centre catering for a wide range of internal and external activities meeting the needs of local sports clubs, societies and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 April 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barrington Brooks | Chair | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Whitlam | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Callan | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Pizey | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denis Goodley | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Clover | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Joe Aldous | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dennis Charles Fisher | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Cameron | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy Barrie Himpleman | Trustee | 17 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARRY COVELEY | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Diane Fisher | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHANE TOVELL | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WESTGATE | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael Munford | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.25k | £130.90k | £281.27k | £179.75k | £172.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.09k | £167.03k | £180.34k | £206.79k | £225.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £55.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.75k | £51.72k | £21.33k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/11/1976 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/03/2015
Charitable objects
PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATION ENTERTAINMENTS OF OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ACLE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ACLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAO Administrator
Acle War Memorial Recreation Centre
Bridewell Lane
ACLE
NORWICH
NR13 3RA
- Phone:
- 01493752043
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window