Financial history THE PRIORY CHARITY

Charity Number: 273022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £916.93k £134.97k £758.82k £416.35k £453.34k
Total expenditure £882.32k £212.60k £350.29k £405.02k £441.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £448.50k £25.00k £388.05k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.49k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £375.21k N/A £370.77k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £89.74k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £448.50k N/A £388.05k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £557.51k N/A £114.83k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £324.81k N/A £235.46k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.72k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A