KENT COUNTY PROFICIENCY TEST COMMITTEE FOR AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate within the area of agriculture, horticulture and related activities and offer bursaries towards the cost of qualifications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 25 March 1977: Standard registration
- KPTCBURSARIES (Working name)
- KENT COUNTY PROFICIENCY TEST COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANNE QUESTED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.59k | £2.52k | £2.53k | £2.58k | £2.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £2.05k | £2.16k | £3.47k | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND NOVEMBER 1976, AS AMENDED 14TH NOVEMBER 1991 AND 25TH OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY THE ADMINISTRATION AND PROVISION OF: (A) PROFICIENCY TESTS IN PRACTICAL AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, FORESTRY AND OTHER INDUSTRIES WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND SUCH GEOGRAPHICAL AREA BY MEANS OF COLLABORATION WITH THE NATIONAL PROFICIENCY TESTS COUNCIL. (B) VALIDATION AND VERIFICATION SERVICES TOWARDS NATIONALLY RECOGNISED QUALIFICATIONS IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, FORESTRY AND OTHER INDUSTRIES WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND SUCH GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED NORMALLY LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL VIEW
CANTERBURY ROAD
BOUGHTON ALUPH
ASHFORD
TN25 4ES
- Phone:
- 01233813688
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window