STIFFKEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stiffkey Village hall is used for any religious/charitable purpose and purposes to promote the spiritual, moral, or physical improvement or welfare and resonable recreation advantage or benefit of the Parishioners of Stiffkey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 March 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Margaret Janey Sugden | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Lawrence | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Roxana Michele Husain | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Geoffrey Maurice Claydon | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Simon Williams | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Guy Crofts Harrison | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Hooper | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.82k | £11.01k | £3.91k | £5.62k | £3.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.62k | £831 | £1.14k | £9.91k | £2.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH DECEMBER 1936. CHARITABLE TRUSTS (VALIDATION) ACT 1954 APPLIED
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE INSTITUTE TO BE USED FOR ANY RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES CALCULATED TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL MORAL MENTAL INTELLECTUAL OR PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT OR WELFARE OF THE PARISHIONERS OF STIFFKEY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STIFFKEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Church Street
Stiffkey
WELLS-NEXT-THE-SEA
Norfolk
NR23 1QJ
- Phone:
- 07973163204
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window