THE SOUTH ISLAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offers Arts & Crafts activities to children and young people in a safe and stimulating environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 June 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tomric Schueller Elmes | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA SCHUELLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHEA WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAUDIA WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE STOKOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38k | £3.55k | £2.19k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £919 | £4.31k | £2.18k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION DRAMA AND OTHER FINE ARTS, ESPECIALLY THOSE ACTIVITIES WHICH SEEK TO MAKE THE ARTS RELEVANT TO THE COMMUNITY, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DRAMATIC IMPROVISATION, LITERATURE, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC, AND TO FORMULATE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR.(B) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE PUBLIC.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 10
Hector Court
Caldwell Street
London
SW9 0HF
- Phone:
- 02077359539
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window