COSSINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING VILLAGE HALL FACILITIES TO COSSINGTON.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 March 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHRYN SHIRLEY BROWN | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JOHN COOPER | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS LIND | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MOORE | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE GREATOREX | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CASSIE NICOLA WATSON | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN FRANCIS DARE | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|||||
KATHY SMITH | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARY POPE | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.28k | £17.49k | £35.51k | £25.53k | £35.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.16k | £17.84k | £17.94k | £19.42k | £28.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | £11.13k | £20.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1962 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE COMMISSION DATED 11 APRIL 2006 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF COSSINGTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COSSINGTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cossington Village Hall
Trivetts Way
Cossington
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA7 8JN
- Phone:
- 01278723816
- Website:
-
cossingtonvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window