Trustees COSSINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 273050
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHRYN SHIRLEY BROWN | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JOHN COOPER | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS LIND | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MOORE | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE GREATOREX | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CASSIE NICOLA WATSON | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bloodworth | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Gane | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARY POPE | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN FRANCIS DARE | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|||||
KATHY SMITH | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.