PORATH YOSEPH FUND (MIDEAS PORETH YUSUFF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust directs the Trustees shall apply the income of the Charity for the maintenance, upkeep and benefit of the Institution in Israel known as Midrash Porat Yosef, established and dedicated for the benefit of the Jewish community in Jerusalem.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Israel
Governance
- 14 April 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID RABSON | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ARIEH TOUSSIA COHEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR M S L STERN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.50k | £32.02k | £27.72k | £39.24k | £39.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.27k | £11.19k | £14.20k | £19.46k | £178.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH AUGUST 1970
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE UPKEEP AND BENEFIT OF THE INSTITUTION STIUATE IN JERUSALEM IN ISRAEL KNOWN AS MIDRASH PORATH YOSEF ESTABLISHED AND DEDICATED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY IN JERUSALEM.
Area of benefit
JERUSALEM ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 ALBERT COURT
PRINCE CONSORT ROAD
LONDON
SW7 2BE
- Phone:
- 02075812387
- Email:
- metropolitan@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window