6TH CROYDON (ST AUGUSTINES) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Scout Association is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local commmunities. The method of achieving the Aim of the Association is by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progessive training based on the Scout Promise and Law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 25 March 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL HILLIER | Chair |
|
||||||
Daniel Hugh Curnyn | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA JANE TAYLOR | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WOODS ASHTON | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HILLIER | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MANSWORTH | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JOAN TYLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.97k | £17.95k | £24.56k | £12.04k | £14.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.77k | £10.60k | £5.27k | £8.68k | £10.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11-13 Bynes Road
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 0PY
- Phone:
- 00000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window