THE INTERNATIONAL CEREBRAL PALSY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A self help group assisting countries developing their services appropriate to local needs for people with cerebral palsy. ICPS also acts as a resource centre providing information on CP to anybody worldwide with an interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Denmark
- Dubai
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- India
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Malta
- Mexico
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Switzerland
- Togo
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
Governance
- 29 April 1977: Standard registration
- ICPS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigar Evgin | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gopi Kitnasamy | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bronya Metherall | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nonyelum Nweke | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Silvina Eckhardt | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mahshid Salehi | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthieu Guillaume Chatelin | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Augustine John Edmund Coughlan | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELENI RODITI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FADIA SAFI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSE ALVARELHAO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.06k | £9.98k | £3.59k | £2.10k | £11.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.40k | £6.50k | £7.94k | £6.73k | £21.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 May 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 DEC 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 SEP 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CEREBRAL PALSY AND RELATED DISORDERS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE DEVELOPMENT OF TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL PALSY TO SECURE THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM CEREBRAL PALSY AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berkeley Hall Marshall Ltd
6 Charlotte Street
BATH
BA1 2NE
- Phone:
- 01225428139
- Email:
- contact@cpint.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window