Governing document THE INTERNATIONAL CEREBRAL PALSY SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 DEC 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 SEP 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CEREBRAL PALSY AND RELATED DISORDERS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE DEVELOPMENT OF TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL PALSY TO SECURE THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM CEREBRAL PALSY AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.