Trustees THE INTERNATIONAL CEREBRAL PALSY SOCIETY
Charity number: 273102

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigar Evgin | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gopi Kitnasamy | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bronya Metherall | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nonyelum Nweke | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Silvina Eckhardt | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mahshid Salehi | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthieu Guillaume Chatelin | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Augustine John Edmund Coughlan | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELENI RODITI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FADIA SAFI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSE ALVARELHAO | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.