OLD BUILDINGS PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
From time to time, the Trust identifies a building which has been neglected and which the Trust considers it has sufficient resources to restore.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 1977: Standard registration
- O B P A R T (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS JODY SELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMYAS CHARLES WADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96 | £23 | £3 | £63 | £229 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.05k | £9.71k | £2.38k | £6.39k | £80.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 Upper Marlborough Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL13UR
- Phone:
- 01727843603
- Email:
- paula.griffiths@iplltd.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window