Financial history DOWN HATHERLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 273117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.84k £14.82k £17.74k £16.40k £26.31k
Total expenditure £8.04k £2.63k £5.31k £12.88k £19.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £11.04k £3.97k £11.44k