RAJPUT SAMAJ OF UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement and instilling the cultural values of the Rajput people in the United Kingdom. RSUK is also actively involved in helping and supporting people affected by world disasters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 September 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DHARMENDRASINH JADEJA | Chair | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sonalba Rathod | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajeshwari Dhanjitsinh Jadeja | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amitsinh Kumpavat | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaypalsinh Ajitsinh Vala | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Radhikaba Mahesh kumar Chudasama | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harshvardhansinh Jayendrasinh Jadeja | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Priyankaba Gohil | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ravirajsinh Zala | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virendrasinh Rathod | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Divyajitsinh Narendrasinh Raol | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janaksinh Dilipsinh Jhala | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mahendrasinh Sardarsinh Jadeja | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hansakunvarba Mahida | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.42k | £11.47k | £18.84k | £19.08k | £17.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.62k | £5.75k | £15.28k | £14.42k | £15.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2021 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION REVISED 31ST JULY 1977 AND AMENDED 22ND APRIL 1979 AND 21 OCTOBER 1990, 19 APRIL 1998, 11TH APRIL 1999, 28 APRIL 2002, 27 APRIL 2003, 20 FEBRUARY 2005 AND 17 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED 01/9/13 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL, CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE WELFARE OF ALL MEMBERS IRRESPECTIVE OF CREED & SEXUAL ORIENTATION, MAINTAINING THE RAJPUT TRADITIONS AND VALUES. TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE CAUSES WHICH THE MEMBERS MAY SEE FIT TO PROMOTE IN RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND FOR SPECIFIC CAUSES ABROAD. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES WHEN POSSIBLE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES, TAKING ACCOUNT OF THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, YOUTH, ELDERS AND DISABLED IN THE RSUK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Vicarage Road
Woodford Green
IG8 8NH
- Phone:
- 07790493571
- Email:
- secretary@rajputsamaj.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window