Financial history ABINGDON OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 273149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.03k £23.99k £62.52k £93.60k £84.40k
Total expenditure £6.11k £32.46k £66.49k £81.45k £78.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A