THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE TORRINGTON AND DISTRICT COTTAGE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the League is to generally support the work of the Hospital by providing where possible suitable equipment. To organise events for the purposes of raising funds for this purpose. The area covered by the Hospital apart from the the town of Torrington extends some 10 - 12 miles around the town.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 25 March 1977: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF TORRINGTON AND DISTRICT COTTAGE HOSPITAL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
shirley Beer | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DIANA DAVEY | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BROWN | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN RUMBOLD | Trustee | 10 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN WOODS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Llewellyn Harry Rumbold | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHLEEN TOOGOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE AYRE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £737 | £143 | £51 | £2.12k | £5.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.12k | £3.31k | £255 | £477 | £316 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH FEBRUARY 1977
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 KINGSMEAD DRIVE
TORRINGTON
EX38 7DD
- Phone:
- 01805625662
- Email:
- richhel23@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window