Financial history THE POINTER RESCUE SERVICE

Charity number: 273168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.83k £100.80k £76.06k £65.51k £49.14k
Total expenditure £35.59k £91.62k £76.16k £71.86k £53.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A