SITTINGBOURNE, MILTON AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities aim is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spriitual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and internation communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
230 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 18 April 1977: Standard registration
- SITTINGBOURNE, MILTON AND DISTRICT SCOUT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Foot | Chair | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tom Manktelow | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Swift | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Till | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Coulter | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Turk | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CURSON | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Maloney | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL DICKENS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.44k | £6.33k | £44.55k | £46.62k | £22.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.44k | £18.24k | £29.94k | £50.15k | £35.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £19.05k | £10.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
SITTINGBOURNE AND MILTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 BORDEN LANE
SITTINGBOURNE
ME10 1DB
- Phone:
- 07786437026
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window