QUWWAT-UL-ISLAM SOCIETY NEWHAM LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Quwwat-Ul-Islam Society Newham London is providing Islamic education in accordance with The Qur`an and Ahadith to the children, adults and elderly people of the local community within the bounds of mosque.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£944,505
Donations and legacies | £155.30k | |
Charitable activities | £789.21k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,075,584
Raising funds | £25.46k | |
Charitable activities | £1.05m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £25.46k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.05m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newham
Governance
- 14 April 1977: Standard registration
- 02 August 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1201384 QUWWAT-UL-ISLAM SOCIETY NEWHAM LONDON
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34m | £1.25m | £1.21m | £1.22m | £944.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.18m | £1.21m | £1.24m | £1.30m | £1.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.86k | £30.17k | £74.28k | £10.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £171.05k | £171.92k | £163.78k | £159.53k | £155.30k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £36.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.17m | £1.08m | £1.01m | £1.06m | £789.21k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.07m | £1.18m | £1.19m | £1.24m | £1.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.88k | £30.63k | £43.77k | £3.53k | £25.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.04k | £0 | £0 | £10.73k | £9.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £73.34k | £42.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £94.81k | £0 | £0 | £54.71k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.97m | £1.95m | £1.91m | £1.88m | £1.85m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.23m | £1.27m | £1.28m | £1.23m | £1.14m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £64.78k | £36.33k | £39.63k | £31.62k | £39.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 141 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/06/1975 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 20 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
3. AIMS AND OBJECTIVES THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM), ABLE SUNNAH WAL JAMMAH, FOLLOWING THE HANAFI FIQH, DEOBANDI, TABLIGHI JAMAAT TO PROMOTE CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS TO PROVIDE A MASJID AND/OTHER FACILITIES FOR HIGH STANDARD RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FACILITIES AND ASSOCIATED CEREMONIES. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: TO SET UP AND MANAGE ISLAMIC GIRL'S SCHOOL (BOTH PRIMARY AND SECONDARY) AT THE HIGHER STANDARD OF NATIONAL CURRICULUM. ENSURE THIS IS FULLY REGISTERED WITH DEPARTMENT FOR CHILDREN, SCHOOLS AND FAMILIES. TO SET UP AND MANAGE ISLAMIC BOYS SCHOOL (BOTH PRIMARY AND SECONDARY) AT THE HIGHER STANDARD OF NATIONAL CURRICULUM. ENSURE THIS IS FULLY REGISTERED WITH .DEPARTMENT FOR CHILDREN, SCHOOLS AND FAMILIES. COLLEGE/UNIVERSITY (A-LEVELS/DEGREES) TO BE SET UP AND MANAGED FOR FUTURE DEMANDS OF THE COMMUNITY. ISLAMIC AWARENESS TO BE PROVIDED TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY I.E. SCHOOLS, POLICE AND GENERAL PUBLIC. TO HELP RAISE FUNDS FOR PEOPLE IN NEED AND CHARITIES ACROSS THE WORLD WHERE THE NEED IS REQUIRED. TO PROVIDE ARRANGEMENTS FOR BURIAL.
Area of benefit
NEWHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window