MISSION MEDIC-AIR TRUST FUND FOR MISSION MEDIC-AIR LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical/health/Sickness Providing medical treatment to people in remote parts of Zambia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 February 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Zambia
Governance
- 14 April 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FLAVIA BWANGA BAXTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/02/2020 | 02/02/2021 | 02/02/2022 | 02/02/2023 | 02/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £150 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 February 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 February 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 February 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 February 2020 | 30 January 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 24 FEBRUARY 1977
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF MISSION MEDIC-AIR LIMITED BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL WELFARE OF PERSONS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM POVERTY DISTRESS MALNUTRITION AND DISEASE
Area of benefit
REPUBLIC OF ZAMBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Ringswell Mews
BATH
BA1 6JE
- Phone:
- 01225282767
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window