Accounts and annual returns THE BROCKLEY COMMUNITY COUNCIL VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 273252
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 June 2024 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required