THE FRIENDS OF THE IVEAGH BEQUEST, KENWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of amenities for Kenwood House
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 April 1977: Standard registration
- 25 April 2017: Funds received from 1122681 KENWOOD DAIRY RESTORATION TRUST
- Friends of Kenwood (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Jennifer Gita Abramsky | Chair | 01 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Patricia Jane Hardy | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Caroline Abraham | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Beverley King | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jerzy Jan Kierkuc-Bielinski | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mala Gole | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Fielding | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH SIDNEY SOLOMONS | Trustee | 22 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elisabeth Payne | Trustee | 06 August 2008 |
|
|||||
Angela Cox | Trustee | 13 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
Richard Louis Ormond | Trustee | 17 April 2005 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Doganis | Trustee | 18 April 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.23k | £59.75k | £79.44k | £369.69k | £36.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.00k | £5.73k | £19.36k | £104.93k | £20.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH FEBRUARY 1977 as amended on 15 Apr 2012 as amended on 15 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
The object of the Association is the promotion and improvement of the amenity for the public at large of the Iveagh Bequest, including Kenwood House, Hampstead Lane, London NW3, its estate and collections, through the support and assistance of a group of Friends.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
K S SOLOMONS & CO
6 RALEIGH CLOSE
HENDON
LONDON
NW4 2TA
- Phone:
- 02082028915
- Email:
- info@friendsofkenwood.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window