GRAIN OF WHEAT INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grain of Wheat (UK) pursues a vision to see children flourish. It gives grants to individuals and organisations in England & overseas which are personally known by trustees and to those linked with the Swiss charity Grain of Wheat International and the Global Children's Forum. Beneficiaries are involved in aspects of children's education, religious activities, recreation and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Burma
- Lebanon
- Romania
Governance
- 13 April 1977: Standard registration
- BRENT CHRISTIAN MISSION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lawrence Michael John Baxter-Brown | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Stephanie Hassall | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Hallam | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Johannes Hondsmerk | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.10k | £8.76k | £24.52k | £11.97k | £2.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.60k | £72.29k | £22.61k | £14.30k | £10.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19/11/1976 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 17/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN A CENTRE AND FUND FOR GUIDING HELPING AND EDUCATING CHILDREN OF ALL AGES NATIONALITIES AND RELIGIONS THROUGH THEIR TRAINING AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL & INTERNATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Threshers Court
Hollins Lane
Forton
PRESTON
PR3 0BS
- Phone:
- 07785975600
- Email:
- ruthhassall@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window