Trustees JAIN ASSOCIATION OF UNITED KINGDOM
Charity Number: 273285

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashish Jain | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pranav Jain | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hitesh Rayani | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Priti Jain | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nikita Jain | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Usha Jain | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geetika Jain | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarita Jain | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arun Kalraiya | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Manoj Jain | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUBAHU SHAH | Trustee | 01 April 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.