EYE AND DUNSDEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of village hall for local community activities including the Parish Council, various exercise classes, private hires for family parties, weddings, wakes and other leisure activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 January 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jemma Phillimore | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID WOODWARD | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|||||
DIANE HONEY | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.29k | £43.46k | £57.88k | £74.91k | £68.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.25k | £32.07k | £32.63k | £77.72k | £71.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.67k | £20.30k | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/03/1977 AS AMENDED ON 22/06/2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS WITHIN THE PARISH OF EYE AND DUNSDEN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS. LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
EYE AND DUNSDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eye & Dunsden Village Hall
Dunsden Green
Dunsden
READING
RG4 9QG
- Phone:
- 01189 470339
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window