Financial history BRITISH HEART RHYTHM SOCIETY (BHRS)

Charity Number: 273307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £106.52k £117.50k £206.96k £156.73k £214.73k
Total expenditure £109.72k £71.72k £102.32k £177.66k £167.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A