Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 273310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 21 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 21 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 June 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 19 June 2020 19 days late Download Open in new window