Trustees THE ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity Number: 273310

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL ANDREW SELWAY | Chair | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Franck | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Steward | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Lowe | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Alison Henderson | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mrs J E Noble | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
AILSA MCMAHON | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Walters | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA JONES | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.