EASTBOURNE TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ETNA provides regular recorded material as a free service to sight-impaired persons in Eastbourne and district.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £1,881
Total expenditure: £13,996

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ETNA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM JOHN EASTBURY Chair
None on record
Suzanne Elizabeth Gordon-Watkins Trustee 11 May 2024
None on record
Susan Mary Mattocks Trustee 22 April 2023
None on record
PAUL WILLIAM MARTIN Trustee 22 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WILLINGDON
Received: On time
Sylvia Pauline Fella Trustee 22 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR & ST PETER, EASTBOURNE
Received: On time
Duncan NIgel George Trustee 22 April 2023
None on record
Susan Jeffreys Trustee 16 July 2019
None on record
JANET DOROTHY ANNE MOTTRAM Trustee 25 May 2013
None on record
BRIAN ROBERT ETHERIDGE Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EASTBOURNE
Received: On time
Dr DAVID HARRY HARRIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6.58k £2.54k £2.59k £1.89k £1.88k
Total expenditure £14.86k £12.87k £14.11k £13.66k £14.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 21 September 2024 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 31 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OLD PARSONAGE BARN
OCKLYNGE ROAD
EASTBOURNE
BN21 1PL
Phone:
01323727273