THE LETCHWORTH CIVIC TRUST

Charity Number: 273336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity distributes its annual income by way of grants or loans to individuals, schools, clubs and other organisations living or operating in LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY to support need in education, training, health, disability, the arts, sport and recreation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £119,889
Total expenditure: £103,247

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1992: Standard registration
  • 11 December 2001: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNDA ANN NEEDHAM Chair 30 September 2019
None on record
Emma Victoria Fernandes Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Charmaine Rogers Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Councillor Daniel Peter Mark Allen Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
Kevin John Richard Jones Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
Ian Mantle Trustee 08 March 2016
None on record
MICHAEL MUIR Trustee 08 December 2015
BALDOCK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 78 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, BALDOCK
Received: On time
HOWARD GARDEN SOCIAL AND DAY CARE CENTRE
Received: On time
COLIN SPARSHOTT Trustee 22 September 2014
BIGGLESWADE UNIT 36 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Received: On time
Maria Harrison Trustee 22 September 2014
THE WINSTON CHURCHILL MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Janet Williams Trustee 22 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £95.33k £100.79k £110.03k £107.15k £119.89k
Total expenditure £70.89k £79.79k £94.83k £76.55k £103.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 14 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 19 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
FUND ESTABLISHED IN 1947 - NO TRACE OF GOVERNING DOCUMENT AND RESOLUTIONS MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2)C & 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A PRIZE TO BE AWARDED ANNUALLY AT FEARNHILL SCHOOL BY THE HEADMASTER.
Area of benefit
LETCHWORTH
Registration history
  • 13 May 1992 : Standard registration
  • 11 December 2001 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
5 Gernon Walk
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
SG6 3HW
Phone:
07785104357
Website:

letchworthct.org.uk