ST EDMUNDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
fINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS FOR THE TREATRMENT OR CARE OF SICK OR DISABLED PERSONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 May 1977: Standard registration
- ST EDMUNDS HOSPITAL AND NURSING HOME LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Clarke | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Mark Patterson | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Shipp | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isa Mary Julia Wakelam | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Stewart Gilmour | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Sonnet | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE HORN | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.54k | £38.00k | £39.94k | £39.07k | £39.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.73k | £80.73k | £168.14k | £150.20k | £150.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND FEBRUARY 1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14TH JUNE 1989 AND 11TH DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABISHED ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS IN WEST SUFFOLK PROVIDING TREATMENT, CARE OR SUPPORT TO SICK OR DISABLED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - NORMALLY LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ellisons Solicitors
Suite 1A
Linden Square
146 Kings Road
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
- Phone:
- 01284763333
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window