Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY OF PAEDIATRIC DENTISTRY
Charity number: 273365

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rachael Elizabeth Nichol | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Isabella Sotir | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shannu Bhatia | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paula Jane Waterhouse | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David John Christian Johnson | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Robert Vernazza | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Catherine Walsh | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Urshla Devalia | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.