THE LENTZ FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity promotes research and education in the fields of peace and conflict reconciliation and resolution
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 May 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR GRAHAM KEMP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DR STEVE WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR EDWARD FRANCIS HALPIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF DAVID WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF NIGEL YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF MAURICE YOLLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6 | £5 | £10 | £5 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 19TH MARCH 1977
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH AND PUBLIC EDUCATION INTO PEACE AND THE CAUSES OF CONFLICT IN HUMAN AND INTERNATIONAL RELATIONSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEEDS METROPOLITAN UNIVERSITY
LEIGHTON HALL
HEADINGLEY CAMPUS
CHURCH WOOD AVENUE
LEEDS
LS6 3QS
- Phone:
- 01138123592
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window