THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
social clubs for women - education & recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 May 1977: Standard registration
- 01 October 2018: Funds received from 1024454 THATCHAM LAKESIDE WOMENS CLUB
- 14 December 2019: Funds received from 1082768 VESTA WOMEN'S CLUB
- 21 June 2021: Funds received from 1038178 THE BAMFORD AND NORDEN WOMEN'S CLUB
- 20 July 2021: Funds received from 1033696 THE OAK FARM WOMEN'S CLUB
- 23 December 2021: Funds received from 1033132 WOODLEY WOMENS CLUB
- 04 January 2022: Funds received from 1031329 SPRINGFIELD WOMEN'S CLUB
- 16 March 2022: Funds received from 1062094 DUKINFIELD WOMENS CLUB
- 29 November 2022: Funds received from 1029932 OAKS LADIES CLUB
- 22 December 2022: Funds received from 1032190 NORTH DERBYSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS
- 31 July 2023: Funds received from 1034317 THE NORTH WARWICKSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN'S CLUB...
- 31 October 2023: Funds received from 1033130 HARVEST END WOMENS CLUB
- 28 October 2024: Funds received from 1022393 WOODVILLE WOMENS CLUB
- N A W C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS BURTON | Chair | 12 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Starkey | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY BIRD | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOAN BRAMLEY | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN HARWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.64k | £47.94k | £27.55k | £55.86k | £53.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.07k | £50.68k | £51.61k | £64.44k | £64.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/12/1950 AS AMENDED ON 01/01/1953 AS AMENDED ON 01/01/1955 AS AMENDED ON 01/01/1965 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/1976 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2016 as amended on 19 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR WOMEN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMENS CLUB
T A CENTRE
312 LONDON ROAD
ROMFORD
ESSEX
RM7 9NH
- Phone:
- 07701394320
- Email:
- nawc@btconnect.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window