Financial history THE OXFORD SAMUEL BECKETT THEATRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 273400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £42.60k £49.56k £37.13k £42.16k £57.63k
Total expenditure £42.80k £21.23k £29.06k £72.17k £14.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A