RIVERSIDE PARENTS, STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fundraise and provide support for the pupils and their families at Riverside School, a school for pupils with a wide range of severe and profound and multiple learning difficulties. Many of our pupils also have autistic spectrum disorder and some have complex medical needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bromley
Governance
- 26 April 1977: Standard registration
- R.P.S. PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- RECTORY PADDOCK SCHOOL PARENTS' AND TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Walters | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||
STEVE SOLOMONS | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.14k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21k | £1.29k | £274 | £350 | £2.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 November 2024 | 500 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 November 2024 | 865 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 November 2024 | 1230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1977 AND 13 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BY;- 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
RIVERSIDE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riverside School
Main Road
St. Pauls Cray
Orpington
BR5 3HS
- Phone:
- 01689870519
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window