Financial history THE NICHOLAS ROTH MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 273429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.58k £180 £680 £683 £30
Total expenditure £12.01k £1.45k £950 £1.25k £950
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A