TENDRING DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Production and distribution of approximately 200 memory sticks containing local news each week to the blind and partially sighted in the Tendring area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 18 May 1977: Standard registration
- TENDRING TALKING TIMES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Twyford | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Tricker | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Robinson | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry William Lilley | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.50k | £3.88k | £23.65k | £2.32k | £5.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.68k | £4.10k | £4.36k | £5.13k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED 7 JUNE 1995 AND 3 JUNE 1998 as amended on 13 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY SIGNTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY HE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
TENDRING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Church Road
CLACTON-ON-SEA
Essex
CO15 6AS
- Phone:
- 01255422307
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window