Financial history IVER AND DISTRICT COUNTRYSIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.21k £909 £275 £350 £0
Total expenditure £2.75k £864 £391 £571 £601
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A