Financial history THE ILIFFE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 273437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £200.85k £28.08k £27.81k £31.84k £33.22k
Total expenditure £177.73k £95.07k £143.56k £94.69k £78.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A