Financial history THE L M KENDON SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 273449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £659.04k £628.65k £617.33k £606.72k £443.28k
Total expenditure £582.75k £529.54k £575.01k £602.60k £577.00k
Income from government contracts £536.59k £502.80k £449.61k £430.08k £300.24k
Income from government grants N/A £12.75k £4.57k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £657.81k £627.59k £595.78k £562.86k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.23k £1.06k £21.55k £43.86k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £582.75k £529.54k £575.01k £602.60k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £135.93k £126.96k £140.20k £148.37k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A