RADIO REDHILL

Charity number: 273475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hospital broadcasting service broadcasting to the patients and staff of the East Surrey Hospital in Redhill.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,946
Total expenditure: £8,278

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL GRAY Chair
None on record
Christopher Nott Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Catherine Munn Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Sian Wallis Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
RICHARD ROBERTS Trustee 12 October 2012
None on record
IAN WILSON Trustee
None on record
NICK HUTCHINGS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.50k £7.11k £9.12k £7.01k £7.95k
Total expenditure £10.74k £7.43k £9.81k £8.05k £8.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Radio Redhill
East Surrey Hospital
Canada Avenue
Redhill
Surrey
RH1 5RH
Phone:
01737488069