Financial history REDE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 273479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024 30/04/2025
Total gross income £21.17k £6.40k £3.69k £4.36k £5.75k
Total expenditure £27.22k £11.08k £7.82k £3.57k £5.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A