WRINGTON MINI-BUS SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide within the area of benefit a community minibus service for the elderly and disabled individuals in need, and for non-profit making community groups which are established to advance education, provide recreational facilities in the interest of social welfare, or to relieve distress or for any other charitable purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- North Somerset
Governance
- 15 June 1977: Standard registration
- 28 June 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 June 2023: Funds transferred to 1196604 WRINGTON MINIBUS SOCIETY CIO
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.34k | £7.89k | £8.94k | £5.48k | £6.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.69k | £7.63k | £9.02k | £3.97k | £7.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH APRIL 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT A COMMUNITY MINIBUS SERVICE FOR CHILDREN , ELDERLY AND DISABLED INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, AND FOR NON-PROFIT MAKING COMMUNITY GROUPS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OR TO RELIEVE DISTRESS, OR FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
VILLAGES OF WRINGTON, REDHILL BUTCOMBE AND BURRINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window