Margate Hebrew Congregation Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of an Orthodox Religious Services under the auspices of the United Synagogue . Providing for local Jewish burial within MHC cemetery . To Provide Community, and educational services to the people of East Kent and Beyond. To provide educational information to Schools, Colleges and Universities , as well as members of the public on Judaism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 23 November 1978: Standard registration
- MARGATE HEBREW CONGREGATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY ISAAC GRADUS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Geraldine Gradus | Trustee | 05 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
TRICA BRADY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jeremy Jacobs | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £1.76k | £294.71k | £204 | £117 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.32k | £6.22k | £1.42k | £5.31k | £2.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 December 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19 APRIL 1978 as amended on 01 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
FOR RELIGIOUS PURPOSES BY THE PROVISION OF A SYNAGOGUE AND BY THE PROVISION OF A RESIDENCE FOR THE MINISTER FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE SYNAGOGUE.
Area of benefit
MARGATE AND ADJOINING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Frith Manor Farm Cottages
Lullington Garth
North Finchley
London
N12 7BS
- Phone:
- 07778035735
- Email:
- treasurer.mhc@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window