Financial history THE OAKLANDS TRUST

Charity Number: 273515
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015
Total gross income £9.93k £8.23k £5.00k £3.81k £4.25k
Total expenditure £10.12k £8.60k £5.00k £3.83k £4.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A