I O U LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IOU Ltd was established to promote, maintain, improve and advance education, particularly by the production of educational plays and the encouragement of the arts, including the arts of drama, mime, dance, singing and music, and to formulate, prepare and establish activities of a charitable nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £188,404 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 June 1977: Standard registration
- IOU (Working name)
- IOU THEATRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Marriage | Chair | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Macauley | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Andrews | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Catherine Waddington | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Clayton | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stella Hall | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shazia Khadim | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Coulson | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shirley May | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Boyes | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Nancy Ellis | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.21k | £297.32k | £431.98k | £381.01k | £332.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £415.31k | £314.78k | £483.42k | £381.01k | £415.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £189.20k | £200.90k | £254.40k | £35.22k | £188.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPARATED 18TH MARCH 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
I O U Ltd
E Mill
Dean Clough Mills
Halifax
HX3 5AX
- Phone:
- 01422 320190
- Email:
- info@ioutheatre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window